O SlideShare utiliza cookies para otimizar a funcionalidade e o desempenho do site, assim como para apresentar publicidade mais relevante aos nossos usuários. Se você continuar a navegar o site, você aceita o uso de cookies. Leia nosso Contrato do Usuário e nossa Política de Privacidade.

O SlideShare utiliza cookies para otimizar a funcionalidade e o desempenho do site, assim como para apresentar publicidade mais relevante aos nossos usuários. Se você continuar a utilizar o site, você aceita o uso de cookies. Leia nossa Política de Privacidade e nosso Contrato do Usuário para obter mais detalhes.

O slideshow foi denunciado.

Gostou da apresentação? Compartilhe-a!

- Copyright by Margaret Pickett 99 views
- Edtc6340 62 lisandra_media_coppyright by lisandramando 298 views
- NAT Reviewer for Grade 6 (Mathematics) by Cristy Melloso 19228 views
- Nat examiner's handbook grade 6 2015 by Donnahvie Chiong 31997 views
- Math Powerpoint For Presentation by Deirdre L. Thorpe 34404 views
- Maths Project Power Point Presentation by Kullegg Maria Reg... 123848 views

Sem downloads

Visualizações totais

1.668

No SlideShare

0

A partir de incorporações

0

Número de incorporações

6

Compartilhamentos

0

Downloads

87

Comentários

0

Gostaram

4

Nenhuma nota no slide

- 1. Everyday Math and Algorithms A Fun Review!
- 2. Partial Products Algorithm for Multiplication
- 3. In the partial-product multiplication algorithm, each factor is thought of as a sum of ones, tens, hundreds, and so on. For example, in 67 x 53, think of 67 as 60 + 7, and 53 as 50 + 3. Then each part of one factor is multiplied by each part of the other factor, and all of the resulting partial products are added together. What is partial-product multiplication?
- 4. Calculate 50 X 60 6 7 X 5 3 Calculate 50 X 7 3,000 350 180 21 Calculate 3 X 60 Calculate 3 X 7 Add the results 3,551 To find 67 x 53, think of 67 as 60 + 7 and 53 as 50 + 3. Then multiply each part of one sum by each part of the other, and add the results. +
- 5. Calculate 10 X 20 1 4 X 2 3 Calculate 20 X 4 200 80 30 12 Calculate 3 X 10 Calculate 3 X 4 Add the results 322 Let’s try another one. +
- 6. Calculate 30 X 70 3 8 X 7 9 Calculate 70 X 8 2,100 560 270 72 Calculate 9 X 30 Calculate 9 X 8 Add the results Do this one on your own. 3,002 Let’s see if you’re right. +
- 7. Now for some fun...
- 8. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 Welcome to Who Wants to be a Millionaire
- 9. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 10. A: Ones C: Hundreds B: Tens D: Thousands 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 Our number system is based on a simple pattern of tens. Each place has ten times the value of the place to its right. Place value tells you how much each digit stands for. In the number 546,872, the 8 is in the ______ place.
- 11. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 12. A: 200 + 400 + 30 + 7 C: 2,000 x 400 x 30 x 7 B: 2,000 + 403 + 7 D: 2,000 + 400 + 30 + 7 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 There are many ways to write the same whole number. How is 2,437 written in expanded form?
- 13. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 14. A: Partial-product multiplication C: Area model B: Traditional multiplication D: Complete number strategy 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 In this multiplication algorithm, each factor is thought of as a sum of ones, tens, hundreds, and so on. Then each part of one factor is multiplied by each part of the other factor, and all of the resulting partial products are added together.
- 15. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 16. A: An even number C: A method for solving a problem B: A fraction D: A pet pig 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 What is an “algorithm”?
- 17. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 18. A: 2,000 C: 200 B: 20 D: 2 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 How much is the 2 worth in 29?
- 19. Congratulations! You’ve Reached the $1,000 Milestone! Congratulations! Congratulations!
- 20. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 21. A: 160 C: 210 B: 250 D: 137 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 Using the partial-products method of multiplication, what is 32 x 5? Hint: Add 30 x 5 and 2 x 5.
- 22. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 23. A: 150 C: 1,800 B: 800 D: 1,500 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 To be able to use the partial-products method, you must be able to multiply by tens. What is 30 x 50? Hint: Multiply 3 x 5 and add the zeros.
- 24. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 25. A: 400 C: 407 B: 40 D: 4 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 How much is the 4 worth in 471?
- 26. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 27. A: 920 C: 720 B: 942 D: 845 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 Using the partial-products method of multiplication, what is 471 x 2? Hint: Add 400 x 2, 70 x 2, and 1 x 2.
- 28. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 29. A: 4,000 x 500 x 10 x 0 C: 400 + 500 + 10 + 0 B: 4,000 + 500 + 10 + 0 D: 1,000 + 500 + 40 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 How would you write 4,510 in expanded notation??
- 30. Congratulations! You’ve Reached the $32,000 Milestone! Congratulations! Congratulations!
- 31. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 32. A: 5,355 C: 9,600 B: 4,972 D: 1,068 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 Using the partial-products method of multiplication, what is 89 x 12? Hint: Add 80 x 10, 80 x 2, 9 x 10, and 9 x 2.
- 33. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 34. A: 50 C: 13 B: 40 D: 200 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 48 x 56 (40 x 50) 2,000 (40 x 6) 240 ( __ x 8) 400 (6 x 8) + 48 2,688
- 35. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 36. A: 5,672,390 C: 1 B: 0 D: 100 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 5,672,390 x 0 = ?
- 37. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 38. A: I don’t like candy C: I like candy a lot B: I like candy a little D: I LOVE CANDY 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 How much do you like candy?
- 39. 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100
- 40. A: Mrs. Agee C: Mrs. Agee B: Mrs. Agee D: Mrs. Agee 50:50 15 14 13 12 11 10 9 8 7 6 5 4 3 2 1 $1 Million $500,000 $250,000 $125,000 $64,000 $32,000 $16,000 $8,000 $4,000 $2,000 $1,000 $500 $300 $200 $100 Who is your favorite teacher?
- 41. YOU WIN $1 MILLION DOLLARS!

Nenhum painel de recortes público que contém este slide

Parece que você já adicionou este slide ao painel

Criar painel de recortes

Seja o primeiro a comentar